FOXFIELD LIGHT RAILWAY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving and Operating a Heritage Steam Railway and Museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 05 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Scragg | Chair | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kieron Rigby | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Adshead | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harry Alcock | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Calvin Eastwood | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Riley | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Healey | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bate | Trustee | 30 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Turner | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dave Allend | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.82k | £125.98k | £255.84k | £230.23k | £287.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.47k | £118.88k | £250.00k | £201.51k | £349.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £91.50k | £24.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 November 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 December 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 December 2020 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 DECEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 4 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ACQUISITION, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK, MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT OF HISTORICAL INTEREST USED OR IN ANY WAY CONNECTED TO THE OPERATION AND RUNNING OF RAILWAYS, AND BY THE OPERATION OF STEAM AND OTHER RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVES AND THE PROVISION OF RAILWAY SERVICES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caverswall Road Station
Blythe Bridge
Stoke on Trent
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST11 9BG
- Phone:
- 01782396210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window