Financial history SITA CORNWALL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1127288
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £981.06k £1.08m £553.07k £131.66k £642
Total expenditure £1.22m £1.15m £799.00k £684.63k £449.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £978.08k £1.08m £552.09k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £2.98k £1.63k £985 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.15m £799.02k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.84k £3.23k £3.40k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.08m £736.43k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A