RAZED ROOF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Razed Roof is an inclusive theatre company offering training, workshops and performance opportunities for adults and young people with and without disabilities and learning difficulties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £6,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLYNNIS BAINBRIDGE | Chair | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karl Holliland | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey India-Brown | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GRIGGS | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Marie Erwood | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Vince | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Klyn | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Shaw | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DOONE | Trustee | 03 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL URQUHART | Trustee | 04 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.22k | £55.44k | £21.48k | £29.03k | £35.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.62k | £22.93k | £49.11k | £53.06k | £49.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | N/A | N/A | £6.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, IN THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Post Office
High Street
Roydon
HARLOW
CM19 5EA
- Phone:
- 01279792571
- Email:
- glynnisb2910@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window