Financial history NO LIMITS COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1127368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.70k £1.59k £125 £1.02k £3.57k
Total expenditure £3.89k £1.76k £726 £2.66k £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A