NO LIMITS COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of people over the age of 16 years with high functioning autism/ Asper Syndrome and their carers resident in and around the Dudley Borough in the West Midlands by the provision of advice, information, resources, education, recreational activities and support with the objective of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
- Herefordshire
- Staffordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Scott | Chair | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jones | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Mayall | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mayall | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID IAN HEEKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70k | £1.59k | £125 | £1.02k | £3.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £1.76k | £726 | £2.66k | £2.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 16 YEARS WITH HIGH FUNCTIONING AUTISM/ASPERGER SYNDROME AND THEIR CARERS RESIDENT IN AND AROUND THE DUDLEY BOROUGH IN THE WEST MIDLANDS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, RESOURCES, EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO HIGH FUNCTIONING AUTISM/ASPERGER SYNDROME.
Area of benefit
DUDLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Summerfields Avenue
HALESOWEN
West Midlands
B62 9NW
- Phone:
- 07796398403
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window