Trustees THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1139440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

43 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Butler Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Professor Michelle Jackson Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Professor Robin Klemm Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Professor Owens Patricia Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Professor Prateek Agrawal Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Professor Noa Zilberman Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Dr Samantha Dieckmann Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr Faridah Zaman Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr Vivien Parmentier Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Professor Elena Seiradake Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Professor Renaud Lambiotte Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Baroness Janet Royall Trustee 01 October 2017
FULL FACT
Received: On time
Professor Louise Mycock Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Dr Francesca Southerden Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Professor Damian Tyler Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Sara Kalim Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Professor Dan Ciubotaru Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Charlotte Potts Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Professor Renier Van der Hoorn Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
Professor Karen Nielsen Trustee 02 July 2013
None on record