Financial history INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR MOTHER AND CHILD HEALTH (IFMCH)

Charity Number: 1127065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2019 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 01/11/2023
Total gross income £12.95k £9.12k £7.77k £8.81k £8.64k
Total expenditure £52.40k £20.90k £13.93k £10.60k £5.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A