MEDWAY AND MAIDSTONE ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide athletics to the community through our membership scheme. Membership of our club is open all sections of the community regardless of race, ethnic origin, nationality, age, disability, gender, occupation, sexual orientation, religion, political or other beliefs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 04 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Kenyon | Chair | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rothery | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Clements | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET NEEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.50k | £23.07k | £34.26k | £33.46k | £41.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.57k | £15.99k | £23.49k | £42.72k | £36.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2023 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2021 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 May 2021 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ATHLETICS IN THE TOWNS OF MEDWAY AND MAIDSTONE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS 2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MEDWAY AND MAIDSTONE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS
Area of benefit
MEDWAY AND MAIDSTONE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 TRUBRIDGE ROAD
HOO
ROCHESTER
ME3 9EW
- Phone:
- 01634256244
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window