SOLA ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOLA ARTS works to bring communities together through the arts and the alleviation of poverty. We have a specialist focus of working with refugees and asylum seekers and people from the BRM communities however, our activities work with all people of all backgrounds including people with disabilities, the elderly for example. We use the arts and Art Therapy as tools for empowering and enabling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2024
Total income includes £34,432 from 6 government contract(s) and £8,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 06 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADELE SPIERS | Chair | 01 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
Hyatt Murshid | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Noel Urbain Barikumwe | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NESRIN YOUSEF | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEE OMAR | Trustee | 25 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | 29/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.74k | £218.83k | £195.64k | £190.94k | £358.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.89k | £159.57k | £206.11k | £228.83k | £267.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.93k | £26.03k | £5.66k | £13.42k | £34.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.87k | £18.17k | N/A | £6.94k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ARTS PROJECTS. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BECOME DISPLACED PERSONS OR REFUGEES FROM THE COUNTRIES OF THEIR ORIGIN OR DOMICILE BY REASONS OF HOSTILITIES, PERSECUTION, OPPRESSION, DISCRIMINATION, NATURAL DISTRESS OR OTHER LIKE CAUSES, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OR NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 3. ANY OTHER PURPOSES CHARITABLE BY LAW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 19
Sola Arts
Toxteth Town Hall
15 High Park Street
LIVERPOOL
L8 8DX
- Phone:
- 01517268440
- Email:
- info@solaarts.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window