Financial history RUILS

Charity number: 1127896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £675.40k £1.29m £1.41m £1.57m £1.95m
Total expenditure £644.97k £1.22m £1.41m £1.55m £1.90m
Income from government contracts £208.76k £228.77k £227.20k £234.01k £365.15k
Income from government grants £26.31k £14.95k £17.46k £19.41k £17.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £52.72k £76.34k £93.45k £110.47k £118.23k
Income - Other trading activities £8.69k £11.23k £11.90k £7.24k £9.16k
Income - Charitable activities £587.25k £1.20m £1.29m £1.45m £1.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £96 £0 £25 £1.61k £6.14k
Income - Other £26.64k £1.40k £19.84k £3.94k £2.93k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £638.96k £1.19m £1.37m £1.50m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.02k £21.11k £34.03k £45.09k £54.79k
Expenditure - Governance £1.94k £6.90k £5.36k £5.45k £9.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0