Accounts and annual returns EAST MANCHESTER ACADEMY

Charity Number: 1126751
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 23 August 2011 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 22 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 23 August 2011 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 21 July 2010 21 days late