ANIMAL RESCUE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Generating funds to assist small animal charities throughout the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Wolstenholme | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Wolstenholme | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.20k | £184.34k | £479.45k | £196.57k | £208.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.89k | £206.11k | £210.68k | £106.79k | £291.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2023
(These accounts |
21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY SUPPORTING LOCALISED ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRES, SHELTERS AND RE-HOUSING PROJECTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEACH COTTAGE
LEYS HILL
WALFORD
ROSS-ON-WYE
HR9 5QU
- Phone:
- 01989566710
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window