Financial history SCHOOL FOOD MATTERS

Charity number: 1134094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.14m £1.52m £802.04k £1.22m £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.46m £930.99k £1.19m £1.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.11k £22.56k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £66.71k £197.89k £27.07k £66.94k £28.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.20m £768.79k £1.01m £1.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29k £192 £54 £1.15k £3.65k
Income - Other £11.26k £122.39k £6.14k £139.66k £2.57k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.44m £911.57k £1.17m £1.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.26k £16.10k £19.42k £20.21k £20.80k
Expenditure - Governance £1.20k £6.00k £4.44k £86.52k £90.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £62.84k £58.58k £63.37k £78.25k £62.52k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0