Financial history CITY OF GOD CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1131100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £267.55k £353.84k £363.74k £415.86k £403.62k
Total expenditure £216.06k £175.23k £343.82k £382.57k £416.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A