THE ADVANCE CHARITABLE FUND UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Australian arts, culture, heritage and science and promoting Australian national history and traditions. Promoting scientific research by Australia's leading institutions. The advancement of environmental protection by promoting the preservation of the natural environment of Australia and promoting civic responsibility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Australia
- United States
Governance
- 24 June 2009: Standard registration
- THE ADVANCE EDUCATIONAL FUND UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Hon Jean Lopes | Chair | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Hylton | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.11k | £3.91k | £604 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £2.81k | £540 | £101.96k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2009 AND BY CHANGE OF NAME 8 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AUSTRALIAN ARTS, SCIENCE AND HERITAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MHA MacIntyre Hudson
New Bridge Street House
30-34 New Bridge Street
LONDON
EC4V 6BJ
- Phone:
- +61410471867
- Email:
- michelle@advance.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window