The Keith Howard Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to charities which fall within the following:-The Arts, Social Mobility, Animal Welfare and Sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 December 2008: Standard registration
- THE EMERALD FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Siobhan Fojt | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Howard Martin Alexander Fojt | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Williams | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JAMES HASYN | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Melissa Tomlinson | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN NOELLE FOJT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80m | £1.20m | £890.00k | £20.04m | £492.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24m | £1.44m | £595.60k | £1.02m | £969.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.80m | £1.20m | £890.00k | £20.04m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.24m | £1.44m | £595.60k | £1.02m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.14k | £9.54k | £9.60k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.23m | £1.43m | £586.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 4 NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 06 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Keith Howard Foundation
12 Wells Promenade
Ilkley
LS29 9LF
- Phone:
- 07908426823
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window