LIFEBEAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE & RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE. DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS & CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY AS MATURE, RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. ADULT EDUCATION/TRAINING TO ENLIVEN LEARNING, INSPIRE FULL PARTICIPATION, BUILD GROUP COHESION & DEVELOP SAFE ENVIRONMENTS WHICH ENABLE AUTHENTIC COMMUNICATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £32,000 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Lancashire
- Leicestershire
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Northamptonshire
- Somerset
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tonie Scott MA/BA/PGCE | Chair | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Anne Cuffaro | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mma Yeebo | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Caroline Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.29k | £231.89k | £340.03k | £307.92k | £226.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.04k | £137.92k | £321.10k | £320.04k | £262.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £37.50k | £72.00k | £67.28k | £49.05k | £32.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 2009 as amended on 10 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: - THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. - PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ADULTS IN SKILLS USING ARTS-BASED PRACTICES THAT CAN BE USED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN GROUP FACILITATION TO ENLIVEN LEARNING, INSPIRE FULL PARTICIPATION, BUILD GROUP COHESION AND DEVELOP SAFE ENVIRONMENTS WHICH ENABLE AUTHENTIC COMMUNICATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANFORD HALL
STANFORD HALL
LUTTERWORTH
LE17 6DH
- Phone:
- 01788860250
- Email:
- admin@lifebeat.co.uk
- Website:
-
LIFEbeat.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window