FESTIVAL PLAYERS - BOLLINGTON

Charity Number: 1128351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education for the public benefit by the promoting of the arts, in particular, but not exclusively, the art of drama including plays, comedies, operettas and other dramatic and operatic works.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,057
Total expenditure: £14,563

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 2009: Standard registration
  • 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 01 November 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diana Gordon Chair 03 July 2019
None on record
Stephanie Nerey Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
PETER CLIFFE Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.44k £6 £4.93k £11.16k £13.06k
Total expenditure £10.10k £794 £5.05k £11.50k £14.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 July 2024 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 LANSDOWNE STREET
MACCLESFIELD
SK10 2QZ
Phone:
01625612055
Website:

No information available