INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PRESIDENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IAUP and its membership provides public benefit by (1) focusing the support of global higher education on behalf of issues on the agenda of the United Nations; (2) furthering role of higher education in promoting international understanding and global social change; and (3) capacity building and leadership development within the higher education sector itself, particularly in the global south.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bangladesh
- China
- Japan
- Mexico
- South Africa
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 23 September 2010: Standard registration
- IAUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sabur Khan | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas David Morales | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Letlhokwa George Mpedi | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tatsuro Tanioka | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brent Thomas White | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fernando Galvan Reula | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fernando Leon-Garcia | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shawn Shiaochun Chen | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr NICHOLAS DAVID JAMES BALDWIN | Trustee | 11 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.63k | £20.02k | £27.79k | £53.05k | £84.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.57k | £44.55k | £43.21k | £23.96k | £29.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SCIENCE, THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY (A) RAISING AWARENESS AND ADVANCING EDUCATION IN RELATION TO HUMAN RIGHTS, AND (B) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT AND RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; AND 3) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY, RECONCILIATION AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BY (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN RELATION TO SUCH MATTERS AND (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING AND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, EACH TO BE ACHIEVED BY FACILITATING THE DEVELOPMENT OF, AND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN, UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS AROUND THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEIGH CHRISTOU & CO
LEOFRIC HOUSE
18B BINLEY ROAD
COVENTRY
CV3 1JN
- Phone:
- 001 (614) 256 4441
- Email:
- presidency@iaup.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window