SOUTH HARFORD & TUCKSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Community Centre which provides facilities for clubs, children's groups and meetings, and also provide a venue for parties and wedding receptions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 20 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Mills | Chair | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Land | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Taylor | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Browes-Walker | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.97k | £34.56k | £49.21k | £59.83k | £80.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.94k | £31.10k | £51.82k | £53.78k | £64.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £29.00k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 30 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH HARFORD AND TUCKSWOOD AND OF NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT: . TO ADVANCE ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING . TO IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOUTH HARFORD AND TUCKSWOOD . TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH HARFORD AND TUCKSWOOD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. . TO SUPPORT THE HARFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LEGAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. . TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES 'AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE OF THE ASSOCIATION MAY DECIDE. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Area of benefit
SOUTH HARFORD AND TUCKSWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harford Community Centre
10 The Lastings
Hall Road
Norwich
NR4 6ET
- Phone:
- 01603 908172
- Email:
- charity@harfordcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window