BOOKHAM YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF A YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE CHARITY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, EDUCATION (E.G. PRE-SCHOOL DAY-CARE AND U3A), MUSIC, SPORTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR THE LOCAL POPULATION OF GREAT BOOKHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. BYCA WORKS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND SURREY COUNTY COUNCIL YOUTH DEVELOPMENT SERVICE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethany Krystyna Nevitt | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Edge | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Craig Downey | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Graham Osborne | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE THOMAS VOSPER | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SPENCER WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Colonel DAVID KEVIN GEORGE COX OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202 | £251 | £1 | £22 | £63 | |
|
Total expenditure | £559 | £149 | £149 | £202 | £158 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF GREAT BOOKHAM, SURREY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS..
Area of benefit
GREAT BOOKHAM, SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Oakdene Close
Great Bookham
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT23 4PT
- Phone:
- 01372801048
- Email:
- bookhamyouth@o2.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window