LEICESTERSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1128575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To further the education of the public in the history of the county of Leicestershire and its communities; to promote and foster public knowledge, understanding and appreciation of the history of the area. To commission, facilitate and promote research into the history of the county of Leicestershire and its communities; to disseminate the useful results of such research for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £33,260
Total expenditure: £24,884

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr DAVID LEWIS WYKES Trustee 20 February 2024
GREAT MEETING (ENDOWMENT FUND) CHARITY
Received: On time
EAST MIDLAND UNITARIANS
Received: On time
ANNESLEY (CLW) TRUST
Received: On time
ESSEX HALL
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF FRANCIS HOPKINSON FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Professor Elizabeth Caroline Tingle Trustee 05 September 2023
THE ROYAL ARCHAEOLOGICAL INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Dr Richard Luther Caradoc JONES Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
PROFESSOR MARILYN UPSTONE MBE FSA Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
SIMON MORFORD GRAVETT Trustee 16 December 2013
LEICESTER AID IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
THE GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY
Recently registered
GEORGE TOWNSEND CHARITY FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
Gordon Drake Arthur Trustee 16 December 2013
THE KIBWORTH BEAUCHAMP RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
WARNING ZONE LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER CHARLES DYER CBE, FBA Trustee
MEDIEVAL SETTLEMENT RESEARCH GROUP
Received: On time
WORCESTERSHIRE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE HEREFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
ROBERT BRUCE COLLINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.13k £8.99k £15.76k £14.33k £33.26k
Total expenditure £29.16k £26.34k £20.91k £17.52k £24.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 July 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MEADOWSIDE
MAIN STREET
KINGS NORTON
LEICESTER
LE7 9BF
Phone:
01162596547