CHILDREN EDUCATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and to relieve the financial hardship for the elderly people and provide general welfare services such as Lunch Club, Day Trips, Sports, Study Support, Social functions and community work in the London Borough of Tower Hamlets
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 05 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMALUR RAHMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nozrul Chowdhury | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruhul Ahmed | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.02k | £11.22k | £9.96k | £4.08k | £10.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76k | £6.19k | £9.57k | £7.29k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
= TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN WHITECHAPEL WARD, BERNER ESTATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE CLASSES AND OTHER COMMUNITY EDUCATION CLASSES. O TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PERSONS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE ON HEALTH, SOCIAL SECURITY, HOUSING ISSUES AND OTHER WELFARE ISSUES. O TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. O TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WHITECHAPEL WARD, BERNER ESTATE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. = IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WHITECHAPEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARKNESS HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE
101 CHRISTIAN STREET
LONDON
E1 1RX
- Phone:
- 07904954838
- Email:
- ceg3@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window