Venturers Trust Endowment Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funding for activities in the Venturers Trust schools to advance the educational offering to the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 09 December 2008: Standard registration
- COLSTON'S GIRLS' SCHOOL ACADEMY ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- COLSTON'S GIRLS' SCHOOL TRUST ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- COLSTON'S GIRLS' SCHOOL TRUST ENDOWMENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SMV Trustee Company Limited | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.99k | £89.24k | £130.85k | £137.64k | £247.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.36k | £61.79k | £228.79k | £149.14k | £161.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 02 MAY 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 THROUGH (1) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE SCHOOLS (2) THE SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES ANYWHERE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (3) THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST THEM IN PURSUING THEIR EDUCATION EITHER AT THE SCHOOLS OR ELSEWHERE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BRISTOL CITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SOCIETY OF MERCHANT VENTURERS
MERCHANTS HALL
THE PROMENADE
CLIFTON DOWN
BRISTOL
BS8 3NH
- Phone:
- 0117 973 8058
- Email:
- info@venturerstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window