MONEY HELPERS (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 December 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window