NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PRISON DENTISTRY UK (NAPDUK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise annual prison dental conference. Represent all members as regards their prison dental activities to all relevant parties. Set up and support regional prison dental groups. Inform all members of any relevant prison dental information through our website and newsletter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WADE MAXWELL HOULDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN JOHN CANTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.35k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £30 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2024 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2024 | 675 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2024 | 1040 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE ORAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF THOSE RECEIVING DENTAL SERVICES WITHIN THE UK PRISON SERVICES AND ASSOCIATION SERVICES; BY A) PROVIDING INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND ADVICE TO PRISON DENTAL PROFESSIONALS. 2. PROVIDING A FORUM FOR EXCHANGE OF IDEAS. 3. PROVIDING A FORUM FOR CONTINUING EDUCATION AND TRAINING. 4. BRINGING PROFESSIONALS TOGETHER TO SHARE BEST PRACTICE. 5. INFLUENCING POLICY RELATING TO PRISON ORAL AND GENERAL HEALTH AT BOTH LOCAL AND NATIONAL LEVEL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 32
Stroud
Gloucestershire
GL6 1DL
- Phone:
- 01798 865196
- Email:
- info@napduk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window