THE PENTECOST CHURCH, LA PEPINIERE, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
integration of youth within the community, help and support for immigrant women from Africa. Children activities within the church. Men's counselling and sports activities for integration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £15,988 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 27 November 2008: Standard registration
- LA PEPINIERE MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROGER TABANI NDOSIMAU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROSE NYOTA | Trustee |
|
||||||
BASALI ETONDO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCISCO BWELA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.49k | £59.12k | £66.15k | £83.73k | £98.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.46k | £45.61k | £57.20k | £62.92k | £63.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.21k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF JESUS CHRIST AS GIVEN IN THE HOLY BIBLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
22 Laurel Road
Handsworth
Birmingham
B21 9PE
- Phone:
- 01214487134
- Email:
- min.roger@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window