STREET CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF POVERTY & HARDSHIP AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING ON THE STREET BY PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, HEALTH, EDUCATION, FAMILY RECONCILIATION AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES; PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN; DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£21,488,600
Donations and legacies | £20.17m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £1.31m | |
Investments | £389 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£22,071,564
Raising funds | £3.22m | |
Charitable activities | £18.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£27 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £769,980 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.22m | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.85m |
People

98 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Liberia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 13 March 2009: Standard registration
- STREET CHILD OF SIERRA LEONE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anthony Wallersteiner MA, PHD | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Daniel David Collison | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
SARAH ELIZABETH HUGHES | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Mary Lynn Davies | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Gabriele Cipparrone | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Kirti Mistry | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew White | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrea Vincenzo Salvato | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dominic James Henry Ashcroft | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
James Sean Ryan | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Gary James Heffernan | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Emanuel Kohnstamm | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Martinus Geradus Johannes Van Den Berg | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicholas Mason | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
David Zachary Lloyd | Trustee | 14 November 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.74m | £13.02m | £17.33m | £20.00m | £21.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.02m | £12.46m | £17.27m | £20.13m | £22.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.94m | £2.38m | £2.43m | £1.47m | £769.98k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.48m | £12.51m | £16.71m | £18.82m | £20.17m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.26m | £508.16k | £626.60k | £1.17m | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £806 | £358 | £353 | £13.63k | £389 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £149.75k | £120.81k | £512.23k | £108.27k | £55.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.45m | £11.09m | £15.32m | £17.44m | £18.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.57m | £1.37m | £1.95m | £2.69m | £3.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £6.18k | £423 | £17.10k | £53.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.90m | £10.33m | £14.40m | £15.84m | £16.87m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.97k | £0 | £8.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.24k | £7.13k | £0 | £8.00k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.26m | £4.54m | £5.01m | £5.14m | £4.62m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £683.48k | £386.15k | £801.36k | £1.05m | £1.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP AMONG CHILDREN LIVING ON THE STREET AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SHELTER, FOOD, HEALTH , EDUCATION, AND OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM APPROPRIATE. B) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN (AS SET OUT IN THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD 1989, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: I) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS II) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS III) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS; IV) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS V) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS; AND VI) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. C) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH AWAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
SIERRA LEONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Street Child
33 Creechurch Lane
LONDON
EC3A 5EB
- Phone:
- 02076147696
- Email:
- info@street-child.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window