CHESS VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chess Valley University of The Third Age is a learning co-operative for people of retirement age which enables members to share a variety of educational, creative, social and leisure activities. Each activity group meets once or twice a month and learning programmes are decided by the group. General meetings, with an invited speaker, are held once a month and are open to all the membership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 November 2008: Standard registration
- CHESS VALLEY U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Robert Cadle | Chair | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Broad | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Windsor | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
West Marshall | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Clark Wilkie | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Bunyan | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Graham Naylor | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GARROOD | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Cobb | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.19k | £25.42k | £34.35k | £57.03k | £61.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.71k | £15.23k | £32.25k | £59.30k | £61.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
AMERSHAM, CHESHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Restharrow
Fox Lane
Holmer Green
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP15 6SA
- Phone:
- 07889 732291
- Email:
- chairman@cvu3a.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window