THE SOMALI COMMUNITY ADVANCEMENT ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCAO's mission is to help elders; women and children from the Somali community integrate better into current society by identifying their needs and providing appropriate solutions. Whether it is helping academically or enhancing skills, SCAO's aim is to empower the community and increase its competency for better social and economic integration into the UK society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAKA WARSAME | Chair | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
kaltun osman | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
yassin olow | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Farah Abdi | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
YASMIN AHMED ISMAIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £480 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2025 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF SOMALI CITIZENS LIVING, PRIMARILY IN WANDSWORTH LONDON BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PURSUIT OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE SOMALI COMMUNITY PRIMARILY LIVING IN WANDSWORTH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND OTHER SERVICES
Area of benefit
WANDSWORTH, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 27
Macey House
40 Surrey Lane
London
SW11 3PR
- Phone:
- 07905321694
- Email:
- fadumo_scao@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window