CARETRADE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CareTrade's mission is to improve the life chances of autistic young people and adults by: creating inspirational work experience, recreational and social opportunities; providing education, employment support and other services to meet the needs of individuals; working with businesses to transform employment for autistic people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,411,313
Donations and legacies | £121.53k | |
Charitable activities | £1.28m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £7.75k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,474,483
Raising funds | £8.88k | |
Charitable activities | £1.47m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,254,734 from 11 government contract(s) and £29,886 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.47m |
People

28 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
- 23 April 2024: Funds received from 1096508 EMPLOYMENT AUTISM
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Sparkes | Chair | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ethnanda Manley-Browne | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nithyambika Gurukumar | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Park | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keval Shah | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £681.75k | £1.29m | £1.17m | £1.29m | £1.41m | |
|
Total expenditure | £545.56k | £1.15m | £1.01m | £1.29m | £1.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £653.29k | £1.09m | £928.98k | £1.12m | £1.25m | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.38k | £110.57k | £39.48k | £39.01k | £29.89k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £14.02k | £185.50k | £206.13k | £134.62k | £121.53k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £667.71k | £1.10m | £959.51k | £1.15m | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16 | £2.41k | £2.40k | £6.94k | £7.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £540.18k | £1.10m | £980.38k | £1.25m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.38k | £51.43k | £29.97k | £36.79k | £8.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £5.95k | £6.13k | £6.97k | £7.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.00k | £13.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £35.57k | £67.66k | £61.98k | £35.93k | £105.22k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £491.49k | £603.58k | £752.75k | £762.61k | £733.63k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £172.06k | £177.75k | £163.55k | £148.12k | £251.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 JANUARY 2009 as amended on 02 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ADDRESSING THE NEEDS OF SOUTHWARK AND LONDON RESIDENTS. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) ADDRESSING THE EMPLOYMENT, VOCATIONAL, SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, RESIDENTIAL AND CARE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM (II) CREATING AND SUPPORTING OTHERS TO CREATE VOCATIONAL, EMPLOYMENT, SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, RESIDENTIAL AND CARE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH AUTISM (III) ADDRESSING THE WORK EXPERIENCE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM WHO ARE STILL AT SCHOOL (IV) WORKING WITH BUSINESSES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM IN THE WORKPLACE AND COMMUNITY AT LARGE AND HELPING THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY PLANS IN RELATION TO PEOPLE WITH AUTISM
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Larcom House
9 Larcom Street
London
SE17 1RT
- Phone:
- 02033756288
- Email:
- INFO@CARETRADEUK.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window