ACTION FOR FAMILY CARERS

Charity Number: 1127164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of persons who are ill, disabled, incapacitated or elderly by the provision of information, education, support, respite care, recreation and advocacy for their Carers

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 2008: Standard registration
  • 13 May 2015: Funds received from 1112328 CARING FOR HARLOW CARERS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ACTION FOR FAMILY CARERS LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tony Dixon Chair 25 January 2018
None on record
Georgia Alice Setchell Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Jillian Fletcher Trustee 06 June 2024
None on record
Duncan Lumley Trustee 16 October 2019
THE CHELMER CANAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Pauline Haggerty Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
Paul Alexander Osman Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record
DENISE FIELDING Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record
COLIN BENNETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £761.52k £806.55k £906.94k £735.35k £665.80k
Total expenditure £824.48k £789.42k £832.78k £666.21k £790.27k
Income from government contracts N/A £71.00k £71.00k £74.00k £96.00k
Income from government grants £158.54k £247.70k £202.78k £91.91k £250.53k
Income - Donations and legacies £67.63k £34.70k £17.86k £29.83k £30.83k
Income - Other trading activities £5.34k £1.88k £9.92k £1.15k £713
Income - Charitable activities £683.00k £769.72k £878.49k £702.09k £624.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.55k £245 £657 £2.28k £9.79k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £821.86k £789.41k £827.46k £666.15k £789.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.63k £11 £5.32k £65 £758
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.10k £2.50k £3.00k £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £383 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £532.26k £727.39k £721.06k £1.17m £833.53k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £135.77k £313.39k £232.90k £614.17k £400.70k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Action for Family Carers
Brickhouse Farm Community Centre
Poulton Close
MALDON
CM9 6NG
Phone:
01621 851640