Accounts and annual returns THE UK FRIENDS OF MICHIGAN TECH FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 1127196
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 21 May 2015 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 02 June 2014 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 21 June 2013 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required