Financial history THE UK FRIENDS OF MICHIGAN TECH FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 1127196
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014
Total gross income £12.93k £5.09k £5.07k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.25k £9.29k £5.42k £1.00k £3.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A