HISTIOCYTOSIS UK (LCH)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 2009: Standard registration
- 09 May 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2009 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 16 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LANGERHANS CELL HISTIOCYTOSIS. TO PROVIDE FUNDS TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO LANGERHANS CELL HISTIOCYTOSIS, ITS CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window