Cornerstone Baptist Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Baptist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 April 2009: Standard registration
- SOUTH PARADE BAPTIST CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Silas | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||
Amy Shipley | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||
Robert Andrew Shepherd | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||
Duncan Stow | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||
Ruth Hughes | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||
Sharon Thresher | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||
Scott Halligan | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.61k | £387.26k | £323.86k | £352.54k | £328.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £392.83k | £360.13k | £337.55k | £335.97k | £324.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 23 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/ OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND/ OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornerstone Baptist Church
1 South Parade
Headingley
LEEDS
LS6 3LF
- Phone:
- 01132754989
- Email:
- info@spbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window