Financial history UK CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS LTD

Charity number: 1127150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £135.08k £135.08k £159.58k £416.00k £250.06k
Total expenditure £81.95k £94.82k £103.23k £182.82k £331.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A