Trustees SUSSEX PATHWAYS LIMITED
Charity number: 1127086

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Leslie Botting | Chair | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Frances Ratcliff | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Coombes | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sellings | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Fradley MBE | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Violet Ljubica Hancock DL | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Milton-Thompson MA, MBA | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN TURNER | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ANGELA PRIOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.