Financial history WEYMOUTH AND DORCHESTER ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1134365
Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.10k £11.88k £10.59k £7.66k £4.44k
Total expenditure £4.52k £4.69k £6.60k £4.76k £23.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A