Accounts and annual returns THE LAWRENCE BURNS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1129579
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 17 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 17 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required