Financial history BUILDING SCHOOLS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1127661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £118.46k £272.12k £146.27k £104.64k £209.14k
Total expenditure £255.34k £175.66k £210.61k £80.15k £135.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A