EASTFEAST TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eastfeast is a team of professional gardeners, artists and teachers that helps schools deliver more effective learning based on working a school allotment through the seasons, culminating in a community feast. We work with students and teachers to develop the outdoor classroom, cultivating shared learning about the world in which we live through food and art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- EASTFEAST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.10k | £134.21k | £216.44k | £165.75k | £93.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.07k | £135.54k | £170.66k | £197.37k | £84.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 17 September 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 28 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 16 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
OBJECT 1 - ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER STUDENTS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THEIR EDUCATION. OBJECT 2 - YOUNG PEOPLE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS" OBJECT 3 - SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (IE DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS); AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS INCLUDING THE IMPORTANCE OF SELF-SUSTAINING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION AT A LOCAL LEVEL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window