LAC INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Love A Child, a Christian based Humanitarian relief agency established in 1985 to carry out Christian missionary work in Haiti, guided by Biblical principles of Evangelism and Love, will provide relief to poor children and families of Haiti by operating an orphanage, many schools, a medical and malnutrition clinic and programs, providing employment and serving more than 40,000 Haitians daily.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Haiti
- United States
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LOVE A CHILD (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A THE RELIEF OF POVERTY INCLUDING BY DONATIONS SUCH AS GARDEN SEEDS, SHOES, CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS AND THE PROVISION OF HOUSING, AGRICULTURAL AID AND ORPHANAGES, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF FEEDING PROGRAMMES AND FISH-FARMS, CHILD SPONSORSHIP PROGRAMMES AND SELF-HELP PROJECTS. B THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF BOOKS AND WORKSHOPS AND THE BUILDING OF SCHOOLS AND TRADE SCHOOLS. C THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CHURCHES AND BIBLE COLLEGES. D THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL HELP, MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND VITAMINS, AND ESTABLISHING CLEAN WATER PROJECTS, AND E TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; IN EACH CASE SOLELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN, BEING THOSE UNDER THE AGE OF 18, AND THEIR PARENTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN HAITI.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window