SOUTHWATER RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VOLUNTARY WORK ON BEHALF OF THE STATUTORY AMBULANCE SERVICE. ATTENDING EMERGENCY CALLS TO OFFER FIRST AID BEFORE THE AMBULANCE ARRIVES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 January 2009: Standard registration
- HORSHAM & SOUTHWATER RESPONDERS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Elizabeth Vickers | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Carol Brock | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Damian Jon Cecil | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY RICHARD BULL | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER ERIC BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE CARMELLA FLORES-MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.41k | £4.18k | £3.85k | £663 | £702 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.85k | £614 | £2.06k | £3.89k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE GROUP IS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN SOUTHWATER AND IT'S NEIGHBOURHOOD BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CARDIAC DEFIBRILLATORS.
Area of benefit
HORSHAM AND SOUTHWATER
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE WOODFORDS
SHIPLEY ROAD
SOUTHWATER
HORSHAM
RH13 9BQ
- Phone:
- 01403730449
- Email:
- pete.buckley@macdream.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window