Financial history INSPIRE NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1129709
Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £206.90k £187.59k £186.11k £152.71k £129.59k
Total expenditure £198.59k £176.67k £132.02k £151.67k £156.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A