GIST Cancer UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give support and (non-medical) advice to patients and their carers affected by gastro-intestinal stromal tumours. We do this by means of a website, and by providing telephone and email help. We also run patient support meetings, and represent patients' interests with health professionals, government agencies and pharmaceutical companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 April 2009: Standard registration
- GCUK (Working name)
- GSUK (Working name)
- GIST SUPPORT UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLAS FRANCIS PUNTIS | Chair | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Hampshire | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Drewe Lacey | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Langford | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lane | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Atlay | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Antony David Manuel | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terence John Riley | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John South | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bridget Bethell | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iria Amalia Formoso Marques | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.34k | £78.13k | £108.92k | £144.98k | £99.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.31k | £64.13k | £100.15k | £93.51k | £85.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 23 MARCH 2009 as amended on 04 Aug 2018 as amended on 06 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PATIENTS WITH GASTRO-INTESTINAL STROMAL TUMOURS (GIST) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO THEM AND THEIR CARERS B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH WITH THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF MORE EFFECTIVE TREATMENT AND CARE FOR PATIENTS WITH GIST C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND HEALTH PROFESSIONALS IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO GIST
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Phillips Grove
Yatton Keynell
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN14 7FA
- Phone:
- 0300 400 0000
- Email:
- admin@gistcancer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window