Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITABLE TRUST FOR MISSIONS OVERSEAS

Charity Number: 1127452
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days