THE BEN BATHURST MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1128984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the efficiency of the armed forces of The Crown, preservation of health and the relief of sickness among serving members of the armed forces

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £116,787
Total expenditure: £152,710

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 April 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Hunt Trustee 31 July 2023
None on record
GEORGE HERVEY-BATHURST Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
Peter Svennilson Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record
Warren Johnstone Trustee 10 August 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £305.00k £27.00k £408 £328.28k £116.79k
Total expenditure £194.46k £132.71k £117.98k £117.51k £152.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ESTATE OFFICE
EASTNOR
LEDBURY
HEREFORDSHIRE
HR8 1RD
Phone:
01531632302
Website:

No information available