THE UNIVERSITIES' CHAPLAINCY IN LEEDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Universities' Chaplaincy in Leeds Trust serves the University of Leeds, Leeds Beckett University, Leeds Arts University and University of Law ( Leeds); supporting the spiritual welfare of students and staff of all faiths and world views. The key aspects of our day to day commitments are: pastoral care, spirituality , worship, ethics and values; community building and community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Professor Simon John Robinson | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosalind May Selby | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Howdle | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Michael Geoffrey John Byde | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Tamara Wilson | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adalberto Arrigoni | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Maluila | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Veronica Margaret O'Mara | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Phil Cardew | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lynne Grey | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles William Shaw | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Darron William Dixon-Hardy CEng FIMMM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.43k | £85.63k | £80.52k | £84.80k | £97.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.05k | £72.55k | £74.01k | £80.47k | £83.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £682 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN LEEDS AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF PREMISES, FACILITIES, MAINTENANCE, PERSONNEL, SUPPORT, ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM RIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FOR: 3.1 THE WORK AND MINISTRY OF THE PERSONS APPOINTED TO UNDERTAKE RELIGIOUS SERVICES, COUNSELLING AND GIVE SPIRITUAL DIRECTION AND TO BE CHAPLAINS = (INCLUDING LAY WORKERS) AT THE UNIVERSITY OF LEEDS AND/OR LEEDS METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY AND THEIR AFFILIATED INSTITUTIONS OR ANY OF THEM; AND 3.2 ADVICE AND COUNSELLING ON THE EDUCATION AND WELLBEING OF STUDENTS, STAFF AND MEMBERS OF SUCH UNIVERSITIES.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF LEEDS
WOODHOUSE LANE
LEEDS
LS2 9JT
- Phone:
- 01133435071
- Email:
- chaplaincy@leeds.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window