EDUCATION AFRICA (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for educational and humanitatian projects in sub saharan Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Botswana
- Central African Republic
- Gabon
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
- 11 April 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 21 March 2013 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITHIN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICAN COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AIMED AT PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window